TRING CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 276980
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 19 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 19 October 2020 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 19 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 19 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 22 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 01 February 2017 On time Download