TRING CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 276980
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £26.21k £19.19k £30.87k £23.79k £12.11k
Total expenditure £20.63k £18.62k £32.14k £22.76k £10.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A