EXETER AND DISTRICT KIDNEY PATIENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide welfare for kidney patients being treated via Royal Devon & Exeter Hospital whether they are recently diagnosed, being treated for renal failure, on dialysis or after being transplanted.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 17 January 1979: Standard registration
- EDKPA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Robbins | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Derek Rolfe | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Garry | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
NICK WOOD | Trustee | 21 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Danny O'Sullivan | Trustee | 12 January 2000 |
|
|
||||
JEAN APLIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH JOHN FORBES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.49k | £50.97k | £110.26k | £57.68k | £20.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.51k | £31.91k | £32.05k | £32.03k | £45.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 24 July 2020 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | 24 July 2020 | 170 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 11 November 2019 | 279 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | 11 November 2019 | 279 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 1ST FEBRUARY 1970 AND AMENDED IN 1977 AND 1978 AND ON 9TH MARCH 1989, 14 MAY 2000 AND 6 MAY 2001
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM DISEASE OR ILLNESS AFFECTING THE KIDNEYS: ESPECIALLY FOR PATIENTS RECEIVING TREATMENT AT THE EXETER KIDNEY UNIT AND ITS SATELLITES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 CROWDEN CRESCENT
TIVERTON
EX16 4ET
- Phone:
- 01884254260
- Email:
- JEANAPLIN@LIVE.CO.UK
- Website:
-
edkpa.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window