Trustees THE CONFERENCE OF RELIGIOUS OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Charity number: 277024

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fr Paul Smyth CMF | Chair | 31 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Sr Anne Morris DHS | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Sr Cath Lloyd RSCJ | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Very Rev Fr Richard Reid CSsR | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Sr Sarah Dobson CJ | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Sister Monica Matthews | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Sister Margaret Mary Donovan HC | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Sister Ellen Teresa Flynn DC | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Robert Marsh OSA | Trustee | 24 May 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Sister Sue Berry | Trustee | 02 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.