ST JOSEPH'S COLLEGE READING TRUST

Charity number: 277077
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £5.14m £5.60m £6.07m £6.56m £6.56m
Total expenditure £5.13m £5.67m £6.28m £6.70m £6.73m
Income from government contracts £96.46k £21.54k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.50k £10.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £59.28k £47.16k £9.87k £9.58k £111.52k
Income - Other trading activities £137.70k £109.30k £133.96k £1.03m £60.26k
Income - Charitable activities £4.94m £4.71m £5.04m £5.42m £6.39m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.01k £206 £141 £0 £250
Income - Other £0 £730.89k £889.83k £104.14k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £9.58k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.03m £5.57m £6.20m £6.61m £6.60m
Expenditure - Raising funds £56.55k £95.57k £82.81k £82.82k £135.38k
Expenditure - Governance £78.77k £85.02k £62.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £41.88k £0 £0 £12.74k £0