THE CITY OF ELY COMMUNITY SERVICE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 277107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £11.92k £9.84k £9.47k £11.32k £12.98k
Total expenditure £12.93k £8.95k £10.03k £10.30k £10.66k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A