Financial history THE ST MARY MAGDALEN OXFORD RESTORATION AND DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 277127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £6.33k £968 £1.32k £2.29k £8.83k
Total expenditure £366.26k £240 £22.80k £10.28k £14.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A