Accounts and annual returns LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY

Charity number: 277173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required