Financial history LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY

Charity number: 277173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £6.08k £6.33k £5.86k £3.76k £791
Total expenditure £0 £98.54k £82.00k £100.00k £114.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A