Accounts and annual returns INSTITUTE OF FOOTBALL MANAGEMENT AND ADMINISTRATION CHARITY TRUST

Charity number: 277200
Charity reporting is overdue by 50 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 50 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 50 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 29 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 08 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 07 April 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 11 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required