Financial history INSTITUTE OF FOOTBALL MANAGEMENT AND ADMINISTRATION CHARITY TRUST

Charity number: 277200
Charity reporting is overdue by 53 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.00k
Total expenditure £6.21k £0 £4.21k £4.75k £4.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A