VISION CRUSADES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for Christian evangelism
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 April 1979: Standard registration
- VISION (Working name)
- VISION CRUSADE TRUST (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BOB CHAMBERLAIN | Chair | 20 November 1995 |
|
|
||||
Christine Jennifer KELLY | Trustee | 21 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith Reginald Kelly | Trustee | 21 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr ROGER PURVIS | Trustee | 20 November 1995 |
|
|||||
ALAN ANDREW MELVILLE | Trustee | 19 December 1977 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN EDWARD BUSHELL | Trustee | 19 December 1977 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.30k | £957 | £1.67k | £1.10k | £1.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £742 | £896 | £1.20k | £1.48k | £1.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19TH DECEMBER 1977
Charitable objects
THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST OUR LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 MANOR VIEW
LIVERPOOL
L12 0LT
- Phone:
- 07899095169
- Email:
- rogerpurvis@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window