Accounts and annual returns WOODLANDS GREEN LTD

Charity number: 277299
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 22 February 2022 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 22 February 2022 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 June 2021 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 June 2021 144 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 17 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 31 March 2019 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 31 March 2019 54 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 27 June 2018 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 27 June 2018 142 days late Download Open in new window