Financial history WOODLANDS GREEN LTD

Charity number: 277299
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £325.76k £317.35k £315.77k £279.16k £331.71k
Total expenditure £452.22k £240.01k £209.58k £241.35k £227.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A