FRIENDS OF GOLDINGTON ACADEMY

Charity number: 277320
Charity reporting is overdue by 816 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 85 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 85 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 450 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 450 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 816 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 816 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 14 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 15 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required