REFUGE

Charity number: 277424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Selina Sagayam Trustee 13 December 2018 None on record
Katie Farrington Trustee 13 December 2018 None on record
Elizabeth Edwards Trustee 06 February 2020
ST OLAVE'S & ST SAVIOUR'S SCHOOLS FOUNDATION CIO Received: On time
Henrietta Barkworth-Nanton Chair 14 May 2020 None on record
Dheepa Balasundaram Trustee 08 November 2021 None on record
Edward James Watson-O'Neill Trustee 06 July 2021
THE BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MENTAL HEALTH AND DEAFNESS Received: 47 days late
Ruth Smith Trustee 06 February 2020 None on record
Kirsten Walkom Trustee 13 December 2018 None on record
Andrea Daniels Trustee 06 February 2020
HACKNEY DOORWAYS Received: On time
Christine Higgins Trustee 13 December 2018 None on record
Jonathan Vincent Dominic Rowney Trustee 06 July 2021 None on record
Carolyn Pearson Trustee 13 December 2018 None on record