THE NATIONAL SERVICE COMMITTEE FOR CATHOLIC CHARISMATIC RENEWAL SERVICES IN ENGLAND AND WALES

Charity number: 277425
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 08 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 26 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 26 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 19 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 19 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 28 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 28 February 2017 On time Download