RAVENSCOTE PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 277432
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 11 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 July 2020 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 08 July 2020 8 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 19 August 2019 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 19 August 2019 50 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 July 2018 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 29 July 2018 29 days late Download