WITNEY TALKING NEWS

Charity number: 277434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 10 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 12 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 26 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 28 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 15 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required