WITNEY TALKING NEWS

Charity number: 277434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £1.90k £2.29k £769 £6.37k £986
Total expenditure £4.80k £2.69k £3.96k £4.33k £1.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A