THE JOHNSON TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 277439
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 July 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 05 July 2021 5 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 July 2020 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 10 September 2020 72 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 27 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 27 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 08 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 08 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 10 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 10 May 2017 On time Download