Financial history THE MARY ROSE TRUST

Charity number: 277503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.41m £3.03m £2.94m £2.18m £3.59m
Total expenditure £4.91m £4.76m £4.39m £3.25m £4.11m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £3.84k £588.87k £1.22m
Income - Donations and legacies £210.61k £498.83k £486.77k £1.72m £1.48m
Income - Other trading activities £681.35k £576.74k £495.07k £54.29k £301.81k
Income - Charitable activities £2.49m £1.91m £1.91m £377.96k £1.79m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.90k £4.30k £1.68k £275 £66
Income - Other £16.88k £40.44k £47.88k £33.78k £14.38k
Income - Legacies £10.50k £0 £0 £1.77k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.07m £4.31m £3.98m £3.14m £3.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £841.11k £450.48k £405.90k £114.84k £305.53k
Expenditure - Governance £20.32k £18.70k £13.64k £12.06k £12.49k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0