Trustees THE MARY ROSE TRUST
Charity number: 277503

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIGEL KEITH PURSE | Chair | 02 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Professor Terence Richard Stevens | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dominic Jones | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Suzannah Rebecca Gabriella Lipscomb | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Timothy Mark Rusby | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
SOPHIA MARY WESTON | Trustee | 09 December 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Robert Bewley | Trustee | 05 December 2014 |
|
|||||||
PROFESSOR VAN Jonathan GORE | Trustee | 11 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Adam Humphryes | Trustee | 28 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN BRANDON | Trustee | 28 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||
RUPERT GREY | Trustee | 11 February 2010 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.