ASSOCIATION FOR INDUSTRIAL ARCHAEOLOGY

Charity number: 277511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £85.64k £184.13k £299.60k £218.43k £181.08k
Total expenditure £166.23k £185.23k £195.62k £197.09k £168.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A