THE BATH THEATRE TRUST

Charity number: 277532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 20 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 11 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 08 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 08 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 12 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required