Trustees NORTH LONDON CHORUS

Charity number: 277544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gary Bilkus Chair 01 May 2017
None on record
Lucy Ellis Trustee 02 December 2021
THE WALLPAPER HISTORY SOCIETY
Received: On time
Vicky Faure Walker Trustee 02 December 2021
None on record
Abigail Dolan Trustee 02 December 2021
None on record
David Stone Trustee 02 December 2021
None on record
Allan Shaun Davies Trustee 10 December 2020
None on record
Kate Hodgkin Trustee 27 February 2020
None on record
Alison Salisbury Trustee 17 January 2019
None on record
ALAN GRAHAM CHANDLER FCCA Trustee
None on record