FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS SPECIAL SCHOOL

Charity number: 277551
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £71.21k £60.73k £32.88k £96.78k £16.65k
Total expenditure £13.42k £128.61k £3.75k £94.98k £22.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A