MARY AGATE HALL TRUST FUND

Charity number: 277567
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 10 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required