Trustees FIRST RICHMOND SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 277706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANGELA FREEMAN HOGGARTH | Chair |
|
||||||
Aya Dibsi | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yuen Ting Wu | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Nicole Vincent | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Arthur Tickner | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jeremy McKeown | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Isaac | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Jane Barkus | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Claire Rees | Trustee | 24 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gurvinder GREGSON | Trustee | 27 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL O'BRIEN | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
SALLY CRANDON-GILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNDA NESBITT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NATALIE NESBITT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.