Accounts and annual returns THE JUBILEE SAILING TRUST

Charity number: 277810
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 March 2019 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 March 2019 55 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window