WHITEHAWK AND MANOR FARM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 277826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 08 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 20 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 03 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 18 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 18 May 2016 On time Download