ROYAL ANTEDILUVIAN ORDER OF BUFFALOES NORTH DEVON PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 15 June 1979: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT GEORGE PAINTER | Trustee | 05 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Colley | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR ANDY GRATTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.50k | £5.20k | £2.58k | £7.72k | £3.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.82k | £4.37k | £2.19k | £4.91k | £4.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13TH NOVEMBER 1965
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF NECESSITOUS BRETHREN OF THE ORDER AND OF NECESSITOUS WIDOWS, ORPHANS OR DEPENDANTS OF DECEASED BRETHREN OF THE ORDER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Como
1, Parklands
SOUTH MOLTON
Devon
EX36 4EW
- Phone:
- 01769 571645
- Email:
- phbmenor2000@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window