RADIO FOREST HOSPITAL RADIO

Charity number: 277847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 29/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £8.73k £7.19k £9.58k £6.40k £9.18k
Total expenditure £6.72k £9.45k £10.07k £9.02k £9.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A