Governing document THE HOLST SINGERS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 SEP 1979 AS AMENDED ON 26 SEP 1983 AS AMENDED ON 27 FEB 2013 AS AMENDED ON 27 APR 2015 AS AMENDED ON 27 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE A PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC AND IN PARTICULAR CONTEMPORARY AND TWENTIETH CENTURY CHORAL MUSIC (INCLUDING CONTEMPORARY AND TWENTIETH CENTURY ENGLISH CHORAL MUSIC) BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.