Accounts and annual returns AGE CONCERN PERRANPORTH AND DISTRICT

Charity number: 278049
Charity reporting is overdue by 140 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 140 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 140 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 March 2022 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required