THE LEATHERSELLERS' COMPANY CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 278072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 18 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 18 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 03 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 03 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 30 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 30 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 10 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 10 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 14 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 14 December 2016 On time Download