THE FRANCIS WINHAM FOUNDATION

Charity number: 278092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £6.47m £72.14k £1.17m £226.47k £994.34k
Total expenditure £449.63k £416.95k £613.54k £934.92k £1.10m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A £80.00k N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £6.47m N/A £1.09m N/A £994.34k
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £80.00k N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £433.64k N/A £593.24k N/A £1.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £16.00k N/A £20.30k N/A £32.20k
Expenditure - Governance £19.24k N/A £24.36k N/A £31.97k
Expenditure - Grants institution £398.69k N/A £541.71k N/A £990.99k
Expenditure - Investment management £16.00k N/A £20.30k N/A £32.20k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A £0