ST MATTHIAS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants for the maintenance and use of St Matthias Old Church Poplar London E14
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 23 July 1979: Standard registration
- 14 December 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £231 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 16 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 22 June 2017 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6TH JUNE 1979
Charitable objects
(A) THE RESTORATION AND FUTURE MAINTENANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF ST. MATTIAS CHURCH, POPLAR LONDON E14, AS A BUILDING OF ARCHITECTURAL AND HISTORIC INTEREST AND (B) THE PROMOTION AT THE SAID BUILDING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF POPLAR AND THE NEIGHBOURING AREA OF EDUCATION AND RECCREATIONAL ACTIVITIES (BEING RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE RECREATIONAL CHARITIES ACT 1960) AND SUCCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
POPLAR AND THE SUROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window