Dogfen lywodraethu GOSPORT AND DISTRICT SPORTS ASSOCIATION FOR THE DISABLED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30TH APRIL 1978, AMENDED 25TH APRIL 1980, 12TH APRIL 1985, 28TH MAY 1993, 27 APRIL 2001 AND 25 APRIL 2003 AS AMENDED ON 05 MAY 2017 AS AMENDED ON 04 MAY 2018 as amended on 04 May 2018 as amended on 05 Jul 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL DISABLED PERSONS RESIDENT IN GOSPORT AND THE ADMINISTRATIVE DISTRICT OF GOSPORT AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR COMPETITIVE AND NON COMPETITIVE SPORT IN THEIR INTEGRATION INTO SOCIETY.
Maes buddion
GOSPORT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.