HOOE AND TURNCHAPEL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a hall for use by any group wishing to further the wellbing of any age group in the Hooe & Turnchapel area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 30 July 1979: Standard registration
- HOOE AND TURNCHAPEL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- LOWER HOOE AND TURNCHAPEL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Ann Milne | Chair | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Megan April Milne | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Boast | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.75k | £21.69k | £6.97k | £6.15k | £7.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.00k | £3.55k | £11.72k | £17.91k | £5.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND MAY 1979 AS AMENDED ON 14 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HOOE AND TURNCHAPEL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTRINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
LOWER HOOE AND TURNCHAPEL
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 ASHERY DRIVE
PLYMOUTH
PL9 9PB
- Phone:
- 01752216661
- Email:
- rosiemilne@msn.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window