NEWHAM TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 278297
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.29k £2.32k £4.35k £624 £4.60k
Total expenditure £3.11k £3.61k £3.80k £3.12k £2.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A