Trustees ST EDMUND'S SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 278301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JACQUELINE ANNE ALLISS Chair
PETER ALLISS MASTERS
Overdue by 512 days
Denise Gardner Trustee 07 November 2019
None on record
Matthew Carter Trustee 29 October 2019
None on record
Jill Taylor Trustee 20 September 2017
None on record
Luke Gerald Michael Trustee 08 February 2016
None on record
NIGEL WILLIAM KAULA Trustee 05 March 2015
None on record
Dr TOBY GILES ANDERSON GRIFFITHS Trustee 04 December 2014
None on record
ISOBEL VICTORIA MAIER Trustee 17 November 2014
None on record
GARETH DOODES Trustee 27 June 2012
None on record
BRYAN EYRE FARLEY BEM Trustee
HASLEMERE FESTIVAL
Received: On time