THE FAITH-KEYWAY TRUST

Charity number: 278314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 23 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 14 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 07 November 2016 On time Download