Accounts and annual returns THE WALSHAM-LE-WILLOWS COMMUNITY COUNCIL

Charity number: 278321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 November 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required