Financial history THE WALSHAM-LE-WILLOWS COMMUNITY COUNCIL

Charity number: 278321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £7.21k £4.46k £4.73k £4.33k £5.25k
Total expenditure £8.09k £4.28k £4.03k £4.13k £6.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A