Accounts and annual returns IPSWICH AND DISTRICT STROKE CLUB

Charity number: 278443
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2020 24 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 20 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 21 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required