THE ARTHUR JAMES PATERSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 278569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 04 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 04 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 04 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 04 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 04 April 2018 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 04 April 2018 58 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 03 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 24 February 2017 19 days late Download