THE ARTHUR JAMES PATERSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 278569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £42.76k £39.58k £73.13k £66.76k £64.73k
Total expenditure £67.08k £66.65k £24.57k £170.43k £22.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A