THE LONGLEY TRUST

Charity number: 278615
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trustees prefer to make donations to smaller, local charitable causes and place applicants in an order of priority as follows: a) Local, principally Crawley based b) Sussex c) National Charities which generally are supported only through their local fund raising efforts under the above categories.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £23,051
Total expenditure: £23,231

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 October 1979: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carolyn Murphy Chair 29 September 2022
None on record
Barbara Robinson Trustee 29 September 2022
None on record
Louise Waugh Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Peter Charles Mansfield-Clark MBE Trustee 17 March 2017
None on record
Marilyn Mansfield-Clark Trustee 17 June 2016
CRAWLEY MUSEUMS CIO
Received: On time
CHRIS CHESHIRE Trustee
CRAWLEY TAG
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £21.20k £16.70k £21.75k £22.02k £23.05k
Total expenditure £21.68k £16.65k £21.13k £24.25k £23.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE LONGLEY TRUST
THE ORCHARD
GLENEAGLES COURT
BRIGHTON ROAD
CRAWLEY
RH10 6AD
Phone:
01293657000
Email:
No information available
Website:

longleytrust.org.uk