THE ST JAMES CLERKENWELL CHARITY

Charity number: 278682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 01 August 2018 30 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2018 30 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 01 August 2017 29 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2017 29 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 01 August 2016 10 August 2017 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2016 10 August 2017 70 days late Download